IA SSB1152 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF410

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 410.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the administration of the veterans trust fund.(See SF 410.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the administration of the veterans trust fund.(See SF 410.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-23SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 410.
2023-02-15SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-02-13SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 3:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-02-13SenateSubcommittee: Reichman, Edler, and Weiner.
2023-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Veterans Affairs.
2023-02-13SenateBy COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

SF410 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 1091.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback