IA SSB1151 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF493
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2353

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 493.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to domestic abuse risk assessment and deterrence.(See SF 493, SF 2353.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to domestic abuse risk assessment and deterrence.(See SF 493, SF 2353.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 493.
2023-02-15SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-02-14SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2023 3:00PM Room 315.
2023-02-13SenateSubcommittee: Taylor, J., Knox, and Shipley.
2023-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2023-02-13SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SF493 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2353. S.J. 315.
SF2353 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 315.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback