IA SSB1149 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF449
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the installation of cattle guards by landowners along certain streets or highways, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the installation of cattle guards by landowners along certain streets or highways, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2017 4:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kapucian, Brown, and Bowman. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SF449 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 959.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1149 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1149.html |