IA SSB1141 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF368
Note: Legislation replaced by HF701
Note: Legislation replaced by HF701
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to restrictions on lawful preexisting nonconforming uses by cities and counties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to restrictions on lawful preexisting nonconforming uses by cities and counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano and Smith, R.. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB100 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 470.
SF368 (Replaced by) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 901.
HF701 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 982.
SF368 (Replaced by) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 901.
HF701 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 982.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1141 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1141.html |