IA SSB1122 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF399
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to radon control and making penalties applicable.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to radon control and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 12:45PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge State Government. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | State Government: McCoy Chair,Bertrand, and Petersen. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | In State Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF399 (Replaced by) 2015-04-02 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 769.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1122 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1122.html |