IA SSB1121 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF122
Note: Legislation replaced by SF386
Note: Legislation replaced by SF386
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a geothermal tax credit available against the corporate income tax and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act creating a geothermal tax credit available against the corporate income tax and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, C. Johnson, and Petersen. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF122 (Replaced by) 2017-02-07 - Subcommittee: Vander Linden, McConkey and Windschitl. H.J. 244.
SF386 (Replaced by) 2017-03-07 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Quirmbach, and Smith. S.J. 508.
SF386 (Replaced by) 2017-03-07 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Quirmbach, and Smith. S.J. 508.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1121 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1121.html |