IA SSB1114 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF425
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the definition of meeting and public notice requirements under the open meetings law.(See SF 425.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the definition of meeting and public notice requirements under the open meetings law.(See SF 425.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 425. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2021 2:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Guth, Jochum, and Johnson. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF425 (Replaced by) 2021-03-24 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2021 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1114 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1114.html |