IA SSB1107 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF463
Note: Legislation replaced by HF569
Note: Legislation replaced by HF569
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning authorized investment vehicles in a tax-sheltered investment program established by the department of administrative services.
Title
A bill for an act concerning authorized investment vehicles in a tax-sheltered investment program established by the department of administrative services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Smith, and Petersen. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB115 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 512.
SF463 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. S.J. 978.
HF569 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149.
SF463 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. S.J. 978.
HF569 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1149.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1107 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1107.html |