IA SSB1101 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF688
Note: Legislation replaced by SF568
Note: Legislation replaced by SF568
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-11 - Committee report recommending passage, renumbered as SF 568.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-11 - Committee report recommending passage, renumbered as SF 568.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the rulemaking process for executive branch agencies and related matters and including effective date provisions.(See SF 568.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning the rulemaking process for executive branch agencies and related matters and including effective date provisions.(See SF 568.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee report recommending passage, renumbered as SF 568. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2023 1:00PM Room G15. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Bousselot, and Jochum. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON ADMINISTRATIVE RULES REVIEW COMMITTEE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB81 (Related) 2023-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 688.
HF688 (Replaced by) 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.
SF568 (Replaced by) 2023-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 940.
HF688 (Replaced by) 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.
SF568 (Replaced by) 2023-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 940.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1101 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1101.html |