IA SSB1100 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to prior authorization exemptions for certain health care providers for specific health care services.
Title
A bill for an act relating to prior authorization exemptions for certain health care providers for specific health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2023 4:00PM Room 315. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Westrich, Petersen, and Webster. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB130 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1100 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1100.html |