IA SSB1100 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF439
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the disposal or return of certain notices and certificates filed or recorded during certain periods of time.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the disposal or return of certain notices and certificates filed or recorded during certain periods of time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 1:00PM Room 206 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Greene, and McCoy. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF439 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1020.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1100 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1100.html |