IA SSB1096 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF193
Note: Legislation replaced by SF274
Note: Legislation replaced by SF274
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to programs and services under the purview of the department of public health including the board of hearing aid dispensers and the medical residency training matching grants program and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to programs and services under the purview of the department of public health including the board of hearing aid dispensers and the medical residency training matching grants program and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Voted - Human Resources. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | 3:00PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Human Resources. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Human Resources: Wilhelm Chair,Mathis, and Segebart. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | In Human Resources |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB83 (Related) 2015-02-03 - Voted - Human Resources.
HF193 (Replaced by) 2015-04-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 798.
SF274 (Replaced by) 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.
HF193 (Replaced by) 2015-04-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 798.
SF274 (Replaced by) 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 932.