IA SSB1092 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 217.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act allowing counties to collect a fee for the issuance and renewal of driver's licenses and nonoperator's identification cards to persons who reside outside the county.(See SF 217.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act allowing counties to collect a fee for the issuance and renewal of driver's licenses and nonoperator's identification cards to persons who reside outside the county.(See SF 217.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 217.
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-01-30SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 10:30AM Room 315.
2023-01-26SenateSubcommittee: Westrich, Shipley, and Winckler.
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, referred to Local Government.
2023-01-26SenateBy COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

HSB95 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 267.
SF217 (Replaced by) 2023-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
HF267 (Replaced by) 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 805.
HF680 (Replaced by) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Koelker. S.J. 842.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback