IA SSB1088 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF415
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol or drug-related overdoses or protection from certain crimes, and modifying penalties.
Title
A bill for an act providing immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol or drug-related overdoses or protection from certain crimes, and modifying penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 12:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Edler, and Bisignano. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF415 (Replaced by) 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1088 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1088.html |