IA SSB1087 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the economic development authority, including certain tax credit programs, the Iowa wine, beer, and spirits promotion board, and the beer and liquor control fund, and including applicability provisions.(See SF 408, SF 575.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the economic development authority, including certain tax credit programs, the Iowa wine, beer, and spirits promotion board, and the beer and liquor control fund, and including applicability provisions.(See SF 408, SF 575.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-23SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 408.
2023-02-02SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 11:00AM Room G15.
2023-01-30SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Koelker.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Commerce.
2023-01-25SenateBy COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE

Same As/Similar To

HSB23 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 641.
SF408 (Replaced by) 2023-04-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 575. S.J. 944.
HF641 (Replaced by) 2023-05-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 951.
HF679 (Replaced by) 2023-05-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 951.
SF575 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback