IA SSB1084 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF466
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the master list for juror service to be updated annually using an electronic data processing system and eliminating jury commissions.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the master list for juror service to be updated annually using an electronic data processing system and eliminating jury commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2017 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2017 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Schneider, and Taylor. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF466 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1084 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1084.html |