IA SSB1077 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF376
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the calculation of certain court costs in probate.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 2:00PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Judiciary: Hogg Chair,Garrett, and Horn. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB37 (Related) 2015-01-27 - 3:30PM; Lobbist Lounge Judiciary.
SF376 (Replaced by) 2015-03-17 - Subcommittee, Hogg, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 599.
SF376 (Replaced by) 2015-03-17 - Subcommittee, Hogg, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 599.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1077 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1077.html |