IA SSB1075 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SR1

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SR 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution relating to the Senate Code of Ethics governing the conduct of members of the Senate in relation to their senatorial duties during the Ninetieth General Assembly.(See SR 1.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution relating to the Senate Code of Ethics governing the conduct of members of the Senate in relation to their senatorial duties during the Ninetieth General Assembly.(See SR 1.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-26SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SR 1.
2023-01-25SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-01-24SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 1:00PM Room 116.
2023-01-24SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Costello, Evans, Jochum, Taylor, T., and Winckler.
2023-01-24SenateIntroduced, referred to Ethics.
2023-01-24SenateBy COMMITTEE ON ETHICS

Same As/Similar To

SR1 (Replaced by) 2023-02-01 - Resolution adopted. S.J. 226.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback