IA SSB1074 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF345
Note: Legislation replaced by HF685
Note: Legislation replaced by HF685
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the payment of required medical aid provided to prisoners of county jails.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the payment of required medical aid provided to prisoners of county jails.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Garrett and Kinney. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB137 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 421.
SF345 (Replaced by) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Garrett, and Kinney. S.J. 86.
HF685 (Replaced by) 2019-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
SF345 (Replaced by) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Garrett, and Kinney. S.J. 86.
HF685 (Replaced by) 2019-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1074 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1074.html |