IA SSB1068 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2017 3:30PM 206 (Cancelled)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2017 3:30PM 206 (Cancelled)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child abuse involving access to a child by a person who is required to register as a sex offender.
Title
A bill for an act relating to child abuse involving access to a child by a person who is required to register as a sex offender.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2017 3:30PM 206 (Cancelled) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chelgren, Costello, and Mathis. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB82 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 11:30AM House Lounge (Cancelled)
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1068 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1068.html |