IA SSB1059 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to peace officers and retired peace officers who provide street or highway driving instruction.
Title
A bill for an act relating to peace officers and retired peace officers who provide street or highway driving instruction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 10:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Lykam, and Shipley. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1059 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1059.html |