IA SSB1039 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF317
Note: Legislation replaced by HF495
Note: Legislation replaced by HF495
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 317.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 317.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to investigations conducted by the office of ombudsman.(See SF 317.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to investigations conducted by the office of ombudsman.(See SF 317.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 317. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2023 4:00PM Room 315. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Boulton, and Koelker. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB146 (Related) 2023-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 495.
SF317 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
HF495 (Replaced by) 2024-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
SF317 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
HF495 (Replaced by) 2024-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1039 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1039.html |