IA SSB1039 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF275
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to public health including public health modernization and boards of health.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to public health including public health modernization and boards of health.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Voted - Human Resources. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 4:00PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Human Resources. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Human Resources: Allen Chair,Segebart, and Wilhelm. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | In Human Resources |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB84 (Related) 2015-02-05 - 7:45AM; House Lounge Human Resources.
SF275 (Replaced by) 2015-04-09 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 814.
SF275 (Replaced by) 2015-04-09 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 814.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1039 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1039.html |