IA SSB1038 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF373
Note: Legislation replaced by SF462
Note: Legislation replaced by SF462
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the transfer of moneys collected by the department of administrative services for furnishing certified abstracts of drivers’ operating records.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the transfer of moneys collected by the department of administrative services for furnishing certified abstracts of drivers’ operating records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 8:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Smith, Lykam, and Zumbach. S.J. 372. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2017 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2017 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Greene, and Lykam. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB68 (Related) 2017-02-14 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 307.
HF373 (Replaced by) 2017-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 847.
SF462 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1020.
HF373 (Replaced by) 2017-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 847.
SF462 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1020.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1038 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1038.html |