IA SSB1036 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF122
Note: Legislation replaced by HF167
Note: Legislation replaced by HF167
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Voted - Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Voted - Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act concerning access to documents during the competitive bidding process for public improvement contracts.
Title
A study bill for an act concerning access to documents during the competitive bidding process for public improvement contracts.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | Senate | Voted - Commerce. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | 2:00PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Commerce. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Commerce: Courtney Chair,Allen, and Sinclair. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | In Commerce |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB70 (Related) 2015-02-03 - Voted - Commerce.
SF122 (Replaced by) 2015-02-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 358.
HF167 (Replaced by) 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 478.
SF122 (Replaced by) 2015-02-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 358.
HF167 (Replaced by) 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 478.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1036 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1036.html |