IA SSB1027 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF169
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 169.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 169.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to promotional play receipts, gambling games, and sports wagering.(See SF 169.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to promotional play receipts, gambling games, and sports wagering.(See SF 169.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 169. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 3:00PM RM 111. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, R., Dawson, and Jochum. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SF169 (Replaced by) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Jochum. S.J. 119.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1027 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1027.html |