IA SSB1024 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF253
Note: Legislation replaced by HF244
Note: Legislation replaced by HF244
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to loan repayments made by the college student aid commission under the mental health professional loan repayment program and including applicability provisions.(See SF 253.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to loan repayments made by the college student aid commission under the mental health professional loan repayment program and including applicability provisions.(See SF 253.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as []. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Taylor, J., Gruenhagen, and Quirmbach. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB47 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 244.
SF253 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Education. S.J. 1091.
HF244 (Replaced by) 2023-02-09 - Subcommittee: Lohse, Brown-Powers and Fry. H.J. 294.
SF253 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to Education. S.J. 1091.
HF244 (Replaced by) 2023-02-09 - Subcommittee: Lohse, Brown-Powers and Fry. H.J. 294.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1024 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1024.html |