IA SSB1017 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF572
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 572.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 572.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations period for criminal and civil actions for sexual abuse, kidnapping, and human trafficking.(See SF 572.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the statute of limitations period for criminal and civil actions for sexual abuse, kidnapping, and human trafficking.(See SF 572.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 572. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 10:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Petersen, and Sinclair. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF572 (Replaced by) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1017 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1017.html |