IA SSB1012 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF232
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pronouncements of death by registered nurses.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pronouncements of death by registered nurses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2017 1:00PM Room 206 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Garrett, and Mathis. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HSB19 (Related) 2017-04-11 - NOBA: Joint Subcommittee
HF232 (Replaced by) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
HF232 (Replaced by) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1012 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1012.html |