IA SSB1011 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF179
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to kidnapping of a minor, and providing penalties.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to kidnapping of a minor, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | 11:00AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | 11:30AM; room 206 Judiciary. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Judiciary: Kinney Chair,Garrett, and Petersen. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | In Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SF179 (Replaced by) 2015-03-24 - Passed subcommittee.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1011 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1011.html |