IA SSB1007 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF587
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2095
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2095
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing county attorneys and assistant county attorneys to obtain a professional permit to carry weapons.
Title
A bill for an act allowing county attorneys and assistant county attorneys to obtain a professional permit to carry weapons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Nunn, Kinney, and Sinclair. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF587 (Replaced by) 2020-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2095. S.J. 165.
SF2095 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2095 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1007 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1007.html |