IA SSB1004 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF82

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating a capital murder offense by establishing the penalty of death for murder in the first degree offenses involving kidnapping and sexual abuse offenses against the same victim who is a minor, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 82.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating a capital murder offense by establishing the penalty of death for murder in the first degree offenses involving kidnapping and sexual abuse offenses against the same victim who is a minor, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 82.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-13SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/14/2021 1:00PM RM 24A.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Schultz.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SF82 (Replaced by) 2021-01-20 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 130.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback