IA SSB1002 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF113
Note: Legislation replaced by HF514

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act allowing certain operating-while-intoxicated offenders to be sentenced as habitual offenders, and making penalties applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act allowing certain operating-while-intoxicated offenders to be sentenced as habitual offenders, and making penalties applicable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-01-15SenateSubcommittee: Nunn, Taylor, R. and Whiting.
2019-01-15SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB29 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347.
SF113 (Replaced by) 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 711.
HF514 (Replaced by) 2019-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 497.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback