IA SR10 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-22 - Referred to Rules and Administration. S.J. 1134.
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-22 - Referred to Rules and Administration. S.J. 1134.
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution recognizing February 17, 2017, as the 175th anniversary of Iowa Wesleyan University.
Title
A resolution recognizing February 17, 2017, as the 175th anniversary of Iowa Wesleyan University.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration. S.J. 1134. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 373. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Resolution filed, referred to Rules and Administration. S.J. 297. |
Same As/Similar To
HR6 (Similar To) 2017-02-16 - Resolution adopted. H.J. 319.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SR10 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Resolutions/Introduced/SR10.html |