IA SJR8 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 653.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 653.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution applying for an Article V convention to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints, and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and requesting Congress to similarly propose such amendments. (Formerly SSB 1110.)
Title
A joint resolution applying for an Article V convention to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints, and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and requesting Congress to similarly propose such amendments. (Formerly SSB 1110.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 653. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Jochum, and Schneider. S.J. 67. |
2017-04-22 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1134. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 838. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3170 filed. S.J. 674. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Attached to similar HJR 12. S.J. 649. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 464. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 452. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1110 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SJR8 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Resolutions/Introduced/SJR8.html |