IA SJR10 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the rights of a crime victim.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the rights of a crime victim.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 4:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Kinney, and Sinclair. S.J. 390. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 386. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SJR10 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SJR10.html |