IA SF84 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 210. S.J. 260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 210. S.J. 260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the designation of a lay caregiver relating to a patient's inpatient stay at a hospital. (See SF 210.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the designation of a lay caregiver relating to a patient's inpatient stay at a hospital. (See SF 210.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 210. S.J. 260. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Johnson, and Ragan. S.J. 187. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 144. |
Same As/Similar To
SF210 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 927.
HF340 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 688.
HF533 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 688.
HF340 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 688.
HF533 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 688.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF84 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF84.html |