IA SF83 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to instruction relating to gender identity in the curriculum provided to students enrolled in kindergarten through grade eight in school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools and creating a private cause of action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to instruction relating to gender identity in the curriculum provided to students enrolled in kindergarten through grade eight in school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools and creating a private cause of action.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-01-30SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 12:00PM Room G15.
2023-01-24SenateSubcommittee: J. Taylor, Quirmbach, and Westrich. S.J. 177.
2023-01-17SenateIntroduced, referred to Education. S.J. 139.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback