IA SF8 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 335. S.J. 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 335. S.J. 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing daylight saving time as the official time in this state throughout the year.(See SF 335.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing daylight saving time as the official time in this state throughout the year.(See SF 335.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 335. S.J. 337. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 3:00PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Bisignano, and Guth. S.J. 111. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 21. |
Same As/Similar To
SF335 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 726.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF8 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF8.html |