IA SF75 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the disclosure of mental health information to law enforcement professionals. (See SF 453.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the disclosure of mental health information to law enforcement professionals. (See SF 453.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, C. Johnson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 99. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 79. |
Same As/Similar To
SF453 (Similar To) 2017-03-31 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 838.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF75 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF75.html |