IA SF619 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local revenue and finance by modifying future tax contingencies, the state inheritance tax, the sales and use tax relating to food banks, the tax on promotional play receipts, mental health and disability services funding, school district funding, commercial and industrial property tax replacement payments, providing for housing incentives, providing for other properly related matters, making appropriations, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1276.) Effective date: Enactment, 07/01/2022, 07/01/2029, 01/01/2022, 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 03/17/2020, 01/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local revenue and finance by modifying future tax contingencies, the state inheritance tax, the sales and use tax relating to food banks, the tax on promotional play receipts, mental health and disability services funding, school district funding, commercial and industrial property tax replacement payments, providing for housing incentives, providing for other properly related matters, making appropriations, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1276.) Effective date: Enactment, 07/01/2022, 07/01/2029, 01/01/2022, 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 03/17/2020, 01/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1523 be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1522 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1521 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1520 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1519 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1518 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1517 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1516 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1515 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - Shall Rule 75 be suspended? (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3213 to amendment S–3209 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3211 to amendment S–3209 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - Shall Rule 75 be suspended? (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1523 be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1522 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1521 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1520 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1519 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1518 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1517 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1516 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall amendment H–1515 be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - Shall Rule 75 be suspended? (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3213 to amendment S–3209 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3211 to amendment S–3209 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - Shall Rule 75 be suspended? (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1100. |
2021-05-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1164. |
2021-06-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1206. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 64, nays 28. H.J. 1162. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1523 lost. H.J. 1162. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1523 filed. H.J. 1161. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1522 lost. H.J. 1161. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1522 filed. H.J. 1160. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1517 lost. H.J. 1160. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1517 filed. H.J. 1159. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1518 lost. H.J. 1159. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1518 filed. H.J. 1158. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1516 lost. H.J. 1158. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1516 filed. H.J. 1157. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1515 lost. H.J. 1157. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1515 filed. H.J. 1156. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1519 lost. H.J. 1156. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1519 filed. H.J. 1155. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1521 lost. H.J. 1155. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1521 filed. H.J. 1154. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1520 lost. H.J. 1154. |
2021-05-18 | House | Amendment H-1520 filed. H.J. 1153. |
2021-05-18 | House | Substituted for HF 893. H.J. 1153. |
2021-05-18 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-05-17 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 1119. |
2021-05-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1118. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1078. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Secretary's report on correction in engrossment. S.J. 1111. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 29, nays 15. S.J. 1078. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3209 adopted. S.J. 1077. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3213 to S-3209 filed, lost. S.J. 1077. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3211 to S-3209 filed, lost. S.J. 1076. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 1071. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3209 filed. S.J. 1071. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1053. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1051. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1053. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1053. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1276 (Related) 2021-05-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 619.