IA SF61 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Subcommittee reassigned, Sodders, Courtney, and Feenstra. S.J. 116.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for a moratorium on regulations affecting the sale of unprocessed food, and including effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for a moratorium on regulations affecting the sale of unprocessed food, and including effective date provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-23SenateSubcommittee reassigned, Sodders, Courtney, and Feenstra. S.J. 116.
2013-12-31SenateEND OF 2013 ACTIONS
2013-01-29SenateSubcommittee, Sodders, Courtney, and Sorenson. S.J. 141.
2013-01-28SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 122.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback