IA SF608 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, the college student aid commission, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and properly related matters. (Formerly SSB 1250.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act making appropriations to the department of cultural affairs, the economic development authority, the Iowa finance authority, the public employment relations board, the department of workforce development, the college student aid commission, and the state board of regents and certain regents institutions, and properly related matters. (Formerly SSB 1250.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseSigned by Governor.
2019-05-06HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseNOBA: Final
2019-04-24HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 998.
2019-04-24SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1094.
2019-04-24SenatePassed Senate, yeas 37, nays 13. S.J. 1094.
2019-04-24SenateSenate concurred with S-3214. S.J. 1094.
2019-04-24SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3214. S.J. 1079.
2019-04-23HouseImmediate message. H.J. 979.
2019-04-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1012.
2019-04-23HouseNOBA: House Floor
2019-04-23HousePassed House, yeas 60 nays 39. H.J. 968.
2019-04-23HouseCommittee amendment H-1256 out of order. H.J. 968.
2019-04-18HouseNOBA: House Full Approps
2019-04-23HouseAmendment H-1276 filed, adopted. H.J. 968.
2019-04-18HouseNOBA: House Sub
2019-04-18HouseCommittee amendment H-1256 filed. H.J. 926.
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 924.
2019-04-18HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2019-04-16HouseNOBA: Senate Floor
2019-04-16HouseRead first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 861.
2019-04-16HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 860.
2019-04-15SenateImmediate message. S.J. 961.
2019-04-15SenatePassed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18. S.J. 960.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3139 lost. S.J. 959.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3132 withdrawn. S.J. 959.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3138B lost. S.J. 958.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3138A lost. S.J. 958.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3131 withdrawn. S.J. 957.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3135 lost. S.J. 957.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3126 adopted. S.J. 956.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3123 withdrawn. S.J. 956.
2019-04-15SenatePoint of order raised on S-3144, ruled not germane. S.J. 956.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3136 adopted. S.J. 956.
2019-04-15SenateAmendment S-3142 to S-3136 lost. S.J. 955.
2019-04-15SenatePoint of order raised on S-3130, ruled not germane. S.J. 955.
2019-04-09SenateAmendments S-3138, S-3139, S-3142 to S-3136, and S-3144 filed. S.J. 909.
2019-04-08SenateAmendments S-3126, S-3130, S-3131, S-3132, S-3135, and S-3136 filed. S.J. 893.
2019-04-04SenateAmendment S-3123 filed. S.J. 865.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858.
2019-03-28SenateNOBA: Senate Full Approps
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 797.
2019-03-28SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 796.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1250 (Related) 2019-03-28 - NOBA: Senate Sub

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback