IA SF60 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 564. S.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 564. S.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to newborn metabolic screening to include all disorders listed on the recommended uniform screening panel recommended by the United States department of health and human services. (See SF 564.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to newborn metabolic screening to include all disorders listed on the recommended uniform screening panel recommended by the United States department of health and human services. (See SF 564.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 564. S.J. 524. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Segebart, Johnson, and Ragan. S.J. 197. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Jochum, and Johnson. S.J. 126. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 108. |
Same As/Similar To
HF375 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF564 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 569.
SF564 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 569.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF60 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF60.html |