IA SF596 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Subcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 848.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Subcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 848.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the state sales and use tax the purchase price and installation costs of emergency generators used for power outages or natural disasters.
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the state sales and use tax the purchase price and installation costs of emergency generators used for power outages or natural disasters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 848. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Brown, and J. Smith. S.J. 627. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 618. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB149 (Related) 2019-02-24 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF596 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF596.html |