IA SF59 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. S.J. 511.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. S.J. 511.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the redemption and handling of beverage containers and including effective date provisions. (See SF 520.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the redemption and handling of beverage containers and including effective date provisions. (See SF 520.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. S.J. 511. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Celsi, and Rozenboom. S.J. 126. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 108. |
Same As/Similar To
SF520 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF59 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF59.html |