IA SF570 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 835.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 835.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the sexual assault forensic examiner program.(Formerly SSB 1154.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the sexual assault forensic examiner program.(Formerly SSB 1154.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 835. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | HF 603 substituted. S.J. 834. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 603. S.J. 572. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 553. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 551. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1154 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 570.
HSB179 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 603.
HF603 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
HSB179 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 603.
HF603 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.