IA SF561 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1077.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1077.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning disqualification from eligibility for unemployment benefits due to discharge for misconduct. (Formerly SSB 1088.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning disqualification from eligibility for unemployment benefits due to discharge for misconduct. (Formerly SSB 1088.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 738. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 11:15AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2019-03-26 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, McConkey and Wills. H.J. 652. |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 603. |
2019-03-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 599. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 689. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17. S.J. 689. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3058 filed, adopted. S.J. 689. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 523. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 517. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1088 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.