IA SF526 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the emergency detention of a person experiencing a mental health or substance use crisis and access centers.(Formerly SSB 1234.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the emergency detention of a person experiencing a mental health or substance use crisis and access centers.(Formerly SSB 1234.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment S-3097 filed. S.J. 684. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 511. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 506. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1234 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 526.