IA SF521 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to assaults on sports officials, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1193.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to assaults on sports officials, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1193.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-14SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 288.
2024-01-18SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2024-01-17SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2024 10:00AM Room G15.
2024-01-11SenateSubcommittee: Bousselot, Boulton, and Evans. S.J. 97.
2023-06-05SenateReferred to Judiciary. S.J. 1092.
2023-03-07SenateFiscal note.
2023-03-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 503.
2023-03-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 493.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1193 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 521.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback